Senate | 04/27/2021 | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/22/2021 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/22/2021 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/21/2021 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 18 | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Stark, Roberts (Eric) | ||
House | 04/20/2021 | General Order | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Josh) | ||
House | 03/25/2021 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/09/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/09/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/08/2021 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/09/2021 | Coauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Rosino |