House | 04/04/2022 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/31/2022 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/10/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Caldwell (Trey) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 03/01/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Boren |