Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB958 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2021

Enrolled

Bill April 19, 2021

Amended

Bill April 6, 2021
Bill February 26, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 25, 2021