Senate
|
05/20/2022
|
Approved by Governor 05/20/2022
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2022
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2022
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2022
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2022
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2022
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Adoption of amendment rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Considered
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Laid over
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2022
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2021
|
CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Remove Representative Boles as principal House author and substitute with Representative Townley
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2021
|
Second Reading referred to General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2021
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2021
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2021
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2021
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2021
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2021
|
Authored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|