Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB970 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill April 28, 2022
Bill March 2, 2021

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2022

Amended

Bill March 25, 2021
Bill February 10, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2021