Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB974 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 21, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 10, 2022

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2022

Amended

Bill April 13, 2022
Bill March 2, 2022