House | 03/22/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/15/2021 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/15/2021 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 13 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2021 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/25/2021 | Coauthored by Representative West (Kevin) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2021 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Dahm |