House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/14/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Merrick | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2022 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Allen | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Dahm | ||
Senate | 02/24/2021 | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom | ||
Senate | 02/02/2021 | Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2021 | Authored by Senator Bullard |