House | 04/12/2022 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jett | ||
House | 04/12/2022 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/30/2022 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/24/2022 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/24/2022 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 7 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/23/2022 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Allen | ||
Senate | 03/02/2022 | Reported Do Pass Rules committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2022 | Coauthored by Representative Roberts (Sean) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Standridge | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Coauthored by Senator Stephens | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |