Oklahoma 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SJR33 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/20/2022

                             
 
 
Req. No. 2951 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 58th Legislature (2022) 
 
SENATE JOINT 
RESOLUTION 33 	By: Stanley 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
A Joint Resolution directing the Se cretary of State 
to refer to the peopl e for their approval or 
rejection a proposed amendmen t to Sections 8D through 
8F of Article X of the Oklahoma Constitution; 
clarifying language; providing ballot title; 
directing filing; and ordering a special election . 
 
 
 
 
BE IT RESOLVED BY THE SEN ATE AND THE HOUSE OF RE PRESENTATIVES OF THE 
2ND SESSION OF THE 58TH OKLAHOMA LEGISLATURE: 
SECTION 1.  The Secretary of State shall refer to the people for 
their approval or rejection, as and in the mann er provided by law, 
the following proposed amendment to Sections 8D through 8F of 
Article X of the Oklahoma Constitution to read as follows: 
Section 8D.  A.  Despite any provision to the contrary, 
beginning January 1, 2009, each head of household veteran who has 
been honorably discharg ed from active service in any branch of the 
Armed Forces of the United States or Oklahoma National Guard and who 
has been certified by the United States Department of Veterans 
Affairs or its successor to have a one -hundred-percent (100%) 
permanent disability sustained through military action or accident   
 
 
Req. No. 2951 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
or resulting from disease contracted while in such active service or 
the surviving spouse of such head of household veteran shall be 
entitled to claim an exemption for the full amount of all household 
personal property which is subject to ad valor em taxation and which 
is not subject to any form of taxation in lieu of ad valorem 
taxation. 
B.  In order to be eligible for the exemption authorized by this 
section, the individual shall be required to prove residen cy within 
the State of Oklahoma. 
C.  The Legislature shall be authorized to enact such laws as 
may be necessary in order to implement the exemption provided by 
this section; however, the exemption amount shall not be subject to 
modification by such enactme nts and shall be for the full amount of 
the valuation of any household personal property as otherwise 
prescribed by this section. 
Section 8E. A.  Despite any provision to the contrary, 
beginning January 1, 2006, e ach head of household veteran who has 
been honorably discharged from active servic e in any branch of t he 
Armed Forces of the Uni ted States or Oklahoma National Guard and who 
has been certified by the United States Department of Veterans 
Affairs or its successor to have a one hundred percent (100%) 
permanent disability sustained through military action or a ccident 
or resulting from disease contracted while in such active service or 
the surviving spouse of such head of household veteran shall be   
 
 
Req. No. 2951 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
entitled to claim an exemption for the full amount of the fair cash 
value of the homestead. 
B.  In order to be eligible for the exemption authorized by this 
section, the individual shall be required to prove residency within 
the State of Oklahoma and must have previous ly qualified for the 
homestead exemption authorize d by law or be eligible for the 
homestead exemption pursuant to law. 
C.  If a homestead otherwise eligible for the exemption 
authorized by this section is transferred on or after January 1 of a 
calendar year, another homestead property acquired by the qual ifying 
head of household veteran or by the surviving spouse of such 
qualifying head of household veteran shall be exempt to the same 
extent as the homestead property previously owned by such person or 
persons for the year during which the new homestead is acquired and, 
subject to the requirements of this se ction, for each year 
thereafter. 
Section 8F. A.  Despite any provision to the contrary, and 
except as otherwise provided by subsection D of this section, 
beginning January 1, 2015, the surviving spouse o f the head of 
household a servicemember who is determined by the United States 
Department of Defense or any branch of the United States military to 
have died while in the line of duty shall be entitled to claim an 
exemption for the full amount of the fair cash value of the 
homestead until such surviving spouse remarries.   
 
 
Req. No. 2951 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
B.  In order to be eligible for the exemption authorized by this 
section, the surviving spouse sh all be required to prove residency 
within the State of Oklahoma and must have previously qua lified for 
the homestead exempti on authorized by law or be eligible for the 
homestead exemption pursuant to law. 
C.  If a homestead otherwise eligible for the exemp tion 
authorized by this section is transferred on or after January 1 of a 
calendar year, another homestead property acquired by the surviving 
spouse shall be exempt to the same extent as the homestead property 
previously owned by such person for the year d uring which the new 
homestead is acquired and, subject to the requirements of this 
section, for each year thereafter. 
D.  The provisions of this section shall be applicable for the 
2014 calendar year with respect to an existing homestead property 
owned by the surviving spouse of a person previously determined to 
have died while in the line of dut y by the United States Departmen t 
of Defense or applicable branch of the United States military. 
SECTION 2.  The Ballot Title for the proposed Constitutional 
amendment as set forth in SECTION 1 of this resolution shall be in 
the following form: 
BALLOT TITLE 
Legislative Referendum No. ____ State Question No. ____ 
THE GIST OF THE PROPOSITION IS AS FOLLOWS:   
 
 
Req. No. 2951 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
   1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
This measure amends Sections 8D through 8F of Article 10 of the 
Oklahoma Constitution .  It updates and modernizes the language 
for the household property exemption for disabled veterans and 
surviving spouses, the homestead exemption for disabled veterans 
and surviving spouses, and the homestead exemption for surviving 
spouses of veterans who have died in the line of duty by 
replacing the words “head of household” with the words “veteran” 
and “servicemember”. 
SHALL THE PROPOSAL BE APPROVED ? 
FOR THE PROPOSAL — YES _____________ 
AGAINST THE PROPOSAL — NO  _____________ 
SECTION 3.  The President Pro Tempore of the Senate shall, 
immediately after the passage of th is resolution, prepa re and file 
one copy thereof, including the Ba llot Title set forth in SECTION 2 
hereof, with the Secretary of State and one copy with the Attorney 
General. 
SECTION 4.  A special election is hereby ordered to be held 
throughout the State of Oklahoma on the date of June 28, 2022, at 
which time the proposed amendment s to the Oklahoma Constitution, as 
set forth in SECTION 1 of this resolution, shall be submitted to the 
people of Oklahoma for th eir approval or rejection as and in the 
manner provided by law. 
 
58-2-2951 QD 1/20/2022 8:04:22 AM