House | 06/12/2023 | Becomes law without Governor's signature 06/02/2023 | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 05/26/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 05/26/2023 | JCR adopted | ||
Senate | 05/25/2023 | Direct to Calendar | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 05/24/2023 | General Order | ||
Senate | 05/24/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 05/23/2023 | JCR; Do pass, amended by committee substitute Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 05/18/2023 | Second Reading referred to Joint Committee on Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 05/17/2023 | Authored by Representative Wallace, Martinez |