Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1017 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2023