LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2023 Regular Session
House
Bills
HB1028
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma House Bill HB1028
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session
Oklahoma House Bill HB1028
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 29, 2022
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
March 21, 2023
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 12, 2023
Compare
Bill
March 5, 2023
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
March 2, 2023
Compare