House
|
05/01/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron, Menz, Hefner, Ranson, West (Josh)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Authored by Senator Kidd (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Pae
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Rosecrants
|
|
|