Senate | 04/10/2023 | Enacting clause restored | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Finance Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Title stricken | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | General Order | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fetgatter | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative McCall |