Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1130 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2023

Amended

Bill April 11, 2023
Bill February 17, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 14, 2023