Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Standridge
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Woods
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Dahm
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Alvord
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Kidd
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Green
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Murdock
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|