Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1321 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2023