Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Strom |