Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Waldron | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Banning |