House
|
05/26/2023
|
Died in conference
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2023
|
Conference granted, GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2023
|
HC's named: GCCA
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2023
|
Naming of conferees rescinded
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2023
|
SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Alonso-Sandoval
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Ranson
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Baker
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Boles, Moore, Luttrell, Townley, Osburn, Miller, Hasenbeck, Davis, Munson
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Schreiber, Blancett, Dollens
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative West (Tammy)
|
|
|