Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1368 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 26, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 3, 2023