Senate | 04/10/2023 | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pittman | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 27 | ||
House | 03/08/2023 | Considered | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Laid over | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Authored by Senator Coleman (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Bashore |