Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1393 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023