Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1396 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 16, 2023

Amended

Bill April 13, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2023