Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Steagall | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 16 | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Authored by Senator Prieto (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin | ||
House | 02/08/2023 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Culver |