House
|
05/01/2023
|
Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Public Safety
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative Culver
|
|
|