Senate | 04/03/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Authored by Senator Jech (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Archer |