Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1420 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Amended

Bill April 4, 2023
Bill February 16, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 3, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023