House | 02/28/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hardin | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Referred to Transportation | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Withdrawn from Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Referred to Agriculture | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Remove Representative Archer as principal House author and substitute with Representative Grego | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Archer | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | First Reading |