Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Pittman | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Vancuren |