Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1445 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill March 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2023