Senate | 04/13/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 19 | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, CrosswhiteHader, Townley, Roe | ||
House | 03/23/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Conley | ||
House | 02/23/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Hasenbeck |