Senate | 04/19/2023 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/07/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/06/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Moore |