Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1542 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 7, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 20, 2023