Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Authored by Senator Howard (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Worthen |