Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/13/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/09/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 02/15/2023 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative McEntire |