Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1650 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 03/13/2023

                             
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1650 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 1650 	By: McEntire of the House 
 
   and 
 
  Haste of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to managed care; amending 56 O.S. 
2021, Section 4002.12, as last amended by Section 2, 
Chapter 334, O.S.L. 2022 (56 O.S . Supp. 2022, Section 
4002.12), which relates to minimum rates of 
reimbursement; extending the date the Oklahoma Health 
Care Authority shall e stablish minimum rates of 
reimbursement; adding reimbursement fee schedule 
relating to anesthesia; and providing an effective 
date. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     56 O.S. 2021, Section 4002.12, as 
last amended by Section 2, Chapter 334, O.S.L. 2022 (56 O.S. Supp. 
2022, Section 4002.12), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 4002.12 A.  Until July 1, 2026 2031, the Oklahoma 
Health Care Authority shall establish minimum rat es of reimbursement 
from contracted entities to providers who elect not to ente r into 
value-based payment arrangemen ts under subsection B C of this 
section or other alternative payment agreements for health care 
items and services furnished by such provide rs to enrollees of the 
state Medicaid program.  Except as provided by subsectio n I J of   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1650 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
this section, until July 1, 2026 2031, such reimbursement rates 
shall be equal to or grea ter than: 
1.  For an item or service provided by a participating provider 
who is in the network of the contracted entity, one hundred percent 
(100%) of the reimbursement rate for the applicable service in the 
applicable fee schedule of the Authority; or 
2.  For an item or service provided by a non-participating 
provider or a provider who is not in the network of the contracted 
entity, ninety percent (90%) of the reimbursement rate for the 
applicable service in the applicable fee schedule of the Authority 
as of January 1, 2021. 
B.  Notwithstanding any other provision in this section, 
anesthesia will continue to be reimbursed equal to or greater than 
the anesthesia fee schedule established by the Aut hority as of 
January 1, 2021.  Anesthesia providers m ay also enter into value -
based payment arrangements for services furnished to enrollees t o 
the state Medicaid progra m. 
C.  A contracted entity shall offer value-based payment 
arrangements to all provider s in its network capable of entering 
into value-based payment arrangements.  Such arrangements shall be 
optional for the provider but shall be tied to reimbursement 
incentives when quality metrics are met .  The quality measures used 
by a contracted entity to determine reimbursement amounts to   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1650 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
providers in value-based payment arrangements shall align with the 
quality measures of the Authority f or contracted entities. 
C. D.  Notwithstanding any other provision of this sec tion, the 
Authority shall comply with payment methodologies required by 
federal law or regulation f or specific types of providers including, 
but not limited to, Federally Qualifie d Health Centers, rural health 
clinics, pharmacies, Indian Health Care Provid ers and emergency 
services. 
D. E.  A contracted entity shall offer all rural health clinics 
(RHCs) contracts that reimburse RHCs using the methodology in place 
for each specific RH C prior to January 1, 2023, including any and 
all annual rate updates .  The contracted entity shall comply with 
all federal program rules and requirements, and the transformed 
Medicaid delivery system shall not interfere with the program as 
designed. 
E. F.  The Oklahoma Health Care Authority shall establish 
minimum rates of reimburse ment from contracted entities to Ce rtified 
Community Behavioral Health Clinic (CCBHC) providers who elect 
alternative payment arrangements equal to the prospective payment 
system rate under the Medicaid State Plan. 
F. G.  The Authority shall establish an i ncentive payment under 
the Supplemental Hospital Offset Payment Program that is determined 
by value-based outcomes for providers other than hospitals.   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1650 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
G. H.  Psychologist reimburse ment shall reflect ou tcomes.  
Reimbursement shall not be limited to therapy and shall include, but 
not be limited to, testing and assessment. 
H. I.  Coverage for Medicaid ground transp ortation services by 
licensed Oklahoma emergency medical services shall be reimbursed at 
no less than the published Medicaid rates as set by the Aut hority.  
All currently published Me dicaid Healthcare Common Procedure Coding 
System (HCPCS) codes paid by th e Authority shall continue to be paid 
by the contracted entity .  The contracted entity shall com ply with 
all reimbursement policies established by t he Authority for the 
ambulance providers.  Contracted entities shall accept the modifiers 
established by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services 
currently in use by Medicare at the time of the tran sport of a 
member that is dually eligible for Medica re and Medicaid. 
I. J.  1. The rate paid to participating pharmacy providers is 
independent of subsection A o f this section and shall be the same as 
the fee-for-service rate employed by the Authority for the Medicaid 
program as stated in the payment metho dology at OAC 317:30-5-78, 
unless the participating pharmacy provider elects to enter into 
other alternative payment agreements. 
2.  A  pharmacy or pharmacist shall receive direct payme nt or 
reimbursement from the Authority or contracted entity when providing 
a health care service to the Me dicaid member at a rate no less than 
that of other health care providers for providing the same service.   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1650 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
J. K.  The Authority shall specify in the requ ests for proposals 
a reasonable time frame in which a contracted entity shall have 
entered into a certain percentage, as determined by the Authority, 
of value-based contracts with pr oviders. 
K. L.  Capitation rates established by the Oklahoma Health Care 
Authority and paid to contracted entities under capitated contracts 
shall be updated annually and in accor dance with 42 C.F.R., Section 
438.3.  Capitation rates shall be approved as act uarially sound as 
determined by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Ser vices in 
accordance with 42 C.F.R., Section 438.4 and the following: 
1. Actuarial calculations must inc lude utilization and 
expenditure assumptions consistent with industry and loca l 
standards; and 
2.  Capitation rates shall be risk -adjusted and shall inc lude a 
portion that is at risk for achievement of quality and outcomes 
measures. 
L. M.  The Authority may establish a symmetric risk corridor for 
contracted entities. 
M. N.  The Authority shall establish a proce ss for annual 
recovery of funds from, or assess ment of penalties on, contracted 
entities that do not meet the medical loss ratio standards 
stipulated in Section 4002.5 of this title. 
N. O.  1.  The Authority shall, through the finan cial reporting 
required under subsection G of Section 17 4002.12b of this act   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1650 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
title, determine the percentage of health care expenses by each 
contracted entity on primar y care services. 
2.  Not later than the end of the fourth year of the initial 
contracting period, eac h contracted entity shall be currently 
spending not less than eleven per cent (11%) of its total health care 
expenses on primary care services. 
3.  The Authority shall monitor the primary care spending of 
each contracted entity and require each contracted entity to 
maintain the level of spending on primary care services stipula ted 
in paragraph 2 of this subsection. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. 
 Passed the House of Representatives the 9th day of March, 2023. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the ____ day of __________, 2023. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate