HB1650 HFLR Page 1 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION STATE OF OKLAHOMA 1st Session of the 59th Legislature (2023) HOUSE BILL 1650 By: McEntire of the House and Haste of the Senate AS INTRODUCED An Act relating to managed care; amending 56 O.S. 2021, Section 4002.12, as last amended by Section 2, Chapter 334, O.S.L. 2022 (56 O.S . Supp. 2022, Section 4002.12), which relates to minimum rates of reimbursement; extending the date the Oklahoma Health Care Authority shall e stablish minimum rates of reimbursement; adding reimbursement fee schedule relating to anesthesia; and providing an effective date. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. AMENDATORY 56 O.S. 2021, Section 4002.12, as last amended by Section 2, Chapter 334, O.S.L. 2022 (56 O.S. Supp. 2022, Section 4002.12), is amended to read as follows: Section 4002.12 A. Until July 1, 2026 2031, the Oklahoma Health Care Authority shall establish minimum rat es of reimbursement from contracted entities to providers who elect not to ente r into value-based payment arrangemen ts under subsection B C of this HB1650 HFLR Page 2 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 section or other alternative payment agreements for health care items and services furnished by such provide rs to enrollees of the state Medicaid program. Except as provided by subsectio n I J of this section, until July 1, 2026 2031, such reimbursement rates shall be equal to or grea ter than: 1. For an item or service provided by a participating provider who is in the network of the contracted entity, one hundred percent (100%) of the reimbursement rate for the applicable service in the applicable fee schedule of the Authority; or 2. For an item or service provided by a non-participating provider or a provider who is not in the network of the contracted entity, ninety percent (90%) of the reimbursement rate for the applicable service in the applicable fee schedule of the Authority as of January 1, 2021. B. Notwithstanding any other provision in this section, anesthesia will continue to be reimbursed equal to or greater than the anesthesia fee schedule established by the Aut hority as of January 1, 2021. Anesthesia providers m ay also enter into value - based payment arrangements for services furnished to enrollees t o the state Medicaid progra m. C. A contracted entity shall offer value-based payment arrangements to all provider s in its network capable of entering into value-based payment arrangements. Such arrangements shall be optional for the provider but shall be tied to reimbursement HB1650 HFLR Page 3 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 incentives when quality metrics are met . The quality measures used by a contracted entity to determine reimbursement amounts to providers in value-based payment arrangements shall align with the quality measures of the Authority f or contracted entities. C. D. Notwithstanding any other provision of this sec tion, the Authority shall comply with payment methodologies required by federal law or regulation f or specific types of providers including, but not limited to, Federally Qualifie d Health Centers, rural health clinics, pharmacies, Indian Health Care Provid ers and emergency services. D. E. A contracted entity shall offer all rural health clinics (RHCs) contracts that reimburse RHCs using the methodology in place for each specific RH C prior to January 1, 2023, including any and all annual rate updates . The contracted entity shall comply with all federal program rules and requirements, and the transformed Medicaid delivery system shall not interfere with the program as designed. E. F. The Oklahoma Health Care Authority shall establish minimum rates of reimburse ment from contracted entities to Ce rtified Community Behavioral Health Clinic (CCBHC) providers who elect alternative payment arrangements equal to the prospective payment system rate under the Medicaid State Plan. HB1650 HFLR Page 4 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 F. G. The Authority shall establish an i ncentive payment under the Supplemental Hospital Offset Payment Program that is determined by value-based outcomes for providers other than hospitals. G. H. Psychologist reimburse ment shall reflect ou tcomes. Reimbursement shall not be limited to therapy and shall include, but not be limited to, testing and assessment. H. I. Coverage for Medicaid ground transp ortation services by licensed Oklahoma emergency medical services shall be reimbursed at no less than the published Medicaid rates as set by the Aut hority. All currently published Me dicaid Healthcare Common Procedure Coding System (HCPCS) codes paid by th e Authority shall continue to be paid by the contracted entity . The contracted entity shall com ply with all reimbursement policies established by t he Authority for the ambulance providers. Contracted entities shall accept the modifiers established by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services currently in use by Medicare at the time of the tran sport of a member that is dually eligible for Medica re and Medicaid. I. J. 1. The rate paid to participating pharmacy providers is independent of subsection A o f this section and shall be the same as the fee-for-service rate employed by the Authority for the Medicaid program as stated in the payment metho dology at OAC 317:30-5-78, unless the participating pharmacy provider elects to enter into other alternative payment agreements. HB1650 HFLR Page 5 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 2. A pharmacy or pharmacist shall receive direct payme nt or reimbursement from the Authority or contracted entity when providing a health care service to the Me dicaid member at a rate no less than that of other health care providers for providing the same service. J. K. The Authority shall specify in the requ ests for proposals a reasonable time frame in which a contracted entity shall have entered into a certain percentage, as determined by the Authority, of value-based contracts with pr oviders. K. L. Capitation rates established by the Oklahoma Health Care Authority and paid to contracted entities under capitated contracts shall be updated annually and in accor dance with 42 C.F.R., Section 438.3. Capitation rates shall be approved as act uarially sound as determined by the Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Ser vices in accordance with 42 C.F.R., Section 438.4 and the following: 1. Actuarial calculations must inc lude utilization and expenditure assumptions consistent with industry and loca l standards; and 2. Capitation rates shall be risk -adjusted and shall inc lude a portion that is at risk for achievement of quality and outcomes measures. L. M. The Authority may establish a symmetric risk corridor for contracted entities. M. N. The Authority shall establish a proce ss for annual recovery of funds from, or assess ment of penalties on, contracted HB1650 HFLR Page 6 BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments. 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 entities that do not meet the medical loss ratio standards stipulated in Section 4002.5 of this title. N. O. 1. The Authority shall, through the finan cial reporting required under subsection G of Section 17 4002.12b of this act title, determine the percentage of health care expenses by each contracted entity on primar y care services. 2. Not later than the end of the fourth year of the initial contracting period, eac h contracted entity shall be currently spending not less than eleven per cent (11%) of its total health care expenses on primary care services. 3. The Authority shall monitor the primary care spending of each contracted entity and require each contracted entity to maintain the level of spending on primary care services stipula ted in paragraph 2 of this subsection. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective November 1, 2023. COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS AND BUDGET , dated 03/02/2023 - DO PASS, As Coauthored.