Senate | 03/23/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter | ||
House | 02/28/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 02/27/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Emergency added | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Marti |