Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/04/2023 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Amended | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | Authored by Senator Garvin (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/02/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Marti |