Senate | 04/12/2023 | Placed on General Order | ||
Senate | 04/12/2023 | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/06/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 03/20/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/20/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Authored by Senator Paxton (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dollens | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/22/2023 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative Manger |