Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1762 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2023