Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1774 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 14, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 15, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 3, 2023