Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1928 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 17, 2023
Bill February 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill February 22, 2023