House
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved by Governor 05/05/2023
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Enrolled measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Enrolled, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed measure signed, returned to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|