Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1932 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 17, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 20, 2023