House
|
05/01/2023
|
SA's received
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Newhouse
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Prieto
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Seifried
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Green
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Haste
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Thompson (Kristen)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Coauthored by Senator Treat
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Remove as author Senator Treat; authored by Senator Pugh
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Baker
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 18
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author)
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Representative McCall
|
|
|