Oklahoma 2023 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1936 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 5, 2023