Senate | 04/13/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 03/30/2023 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications | ||
House | 03/22/2023 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | First Reading | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | Authored by Senator McCortney (principal Senate author) | ||
House | 03/21/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 02/14/2023 | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
House | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Representative McCall |